MD SB695 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the State Public Information Act Compliance Board and Office of the Public Access Ombudsman; requiring the Governor and the Attorney General to publish on their Web sites specified notice relating to specified applications and the names and qualifications of specified applicants; requiring the Governor to solicit specified recommendations from specified individuals; requiring the Board to report on specified matters to the Governor and General Assembly by October 1, of each year; etc.
Title
General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and Exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2015-04-13 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | House | Delegates Morhaim, Cullison, and Miele |
2015-04-13 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-13 | House | House Refuses to Recede |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Senators Pinsky, Kagan, and Waugh |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2015-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) |
2015-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {386684/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-04-07 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-26 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {504237/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {504237/1 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Appeals
Attorney General
Attorneys' Fees
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Contractors
Court Costs
Damages
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Evidence
Fees
Governor
Identification
Indigent Persons
Inspections
Judicial Review
Liability
Licenses
Mediation
Notices
Ombudsmen
Penalties and Sentences
Pollution
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Information
Records
Reports
Review Boards
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Witnesses
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Appeals
Attorney General
Attorneys' Fees
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Contractors
Court Costs
Damages
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Evidence
Fees
Governor
Identification
Indigent Persons
Inspections
Judicial Review
Liability
Licenses
Mediation
Notices
Ombudsmen
Penalties and Sentences
Pollution
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Information
Records
Reports
Review Boards
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Witnesses