MD SB692 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person responsible for any premises from conducting, causing, permitting, or aiding a neighborhood nuisance or unruly social event; authorizing certain law enforcement officers to issue a citation for certain violations of the Act; specifying who may be issued a citation for certain violations; requiring that a citation include certain information; authorizing a person issued a citation to stand trial if certain notice is filed with the District Court at a certain time; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Neighborhood Nuisance - Civil Penalties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Citations
Civil Actions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
District Courts
Fines
Law Enforcement
Liability
Minors
Noise
Notices
Nuisances
Parents and Guardians
Penalties and Sentences
Repeate Offenders
State's Attorneys
Trials
Volunteers
Civil Actions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
District Courts
Fines
Law Enforcement
Liability
Minors
Noise
Notices
Nuisances
Parents and Guardians
Penalties and Sentences
Repeate Offenders
State's Attorneys
Trials
Volunteers