MD SB687 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that an individual who was appointed to fill a vacancy in an office during the recess of the Senate or who was nominated to fill a vacancy in an office during a regular session of the Senate is prohibited from being nominated for the same office at the same session, unless requested by the Senate, being appointed to the same office during the recess of the Senate, and continuing to serve in the office or being designated to serve in an acting capacity for the same office after a certain time; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Vacancy Reform Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (84-48) (Y: 85 N: 49 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (87-47) (Y: 88 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (39-6) (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 16
2018-03-27SenateReturned Passed
2018-03-26HouseThird Reading Passed (87-47)
2018-03-26HouseMotion Reconsider Third Reading (Delegate Frick) Adopted
2018-03-26HouseThird Reading Passed (84-48)
2018-03-23HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-23HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-23HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2018-03-15HouseHearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-13HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2018-03-12SenateThird Reading Passed (39-6)
2018-03-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {753024/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-07SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Executive Nominations
2018-03-05SenateHearing 3/05 at 5:00 p.m.
2018-02-02SenateFirst Reading Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0687&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0687f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0687t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_16_sb0687t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0687_75302401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0007/sb0687.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0687_exn.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0491.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0687_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0820.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0824.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/ag_letters/sb0687.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback