MD SB681 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting the transfer of a used vehicle from a business entity to a majority owner of the business entity from the requirement to obtain a motor vehicle safety inspection certificate if the vehicle is primarily driven by the majority owner of the business entity and the business entity has been dissolved or is in the process of dissolution.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates - Exception
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-04-06 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {828571/1 Adopted |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 2:30 p.m. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB1315 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Subjects
Certifications
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Safety
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Safety
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 23 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 23 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |