MD SB680 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources and local governing bodies to construct a communication board in each public playground by October 1, 2027; defining "communication board" as a device that displays photos, symbols, or illustrations to enable individuals with limited language skills to express themselves and communicate; and providing for the funding of communication board construction.
Title
State and Local Parks – Playground Accessibility – Communication Boards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB1332 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-09 - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Subjects
Baltimore City
Children
Communications
Counties
Disabled
Education, Boards of
Forests and Parks
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Program Open Space
Public Schools
Signs and Billboards
Sports and Recreation
Children
Communications
Counties
Disabled
Education, Boards of
Forests and Parks
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Program Open Space
Public Schools
Signs and Billboards
Sports and Recreation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 5 | 2001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 5 | 2002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 5 | 2003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 5 | 901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0680?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0680f.pdf |