MD SB680 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that certain vested former members of the Teachers' Pension System of the State Retirement and Pension System who meet certain criteria may commence receipt of a vested allowance while continuing certain employment with certain participating employers; requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to accept certain forms that were timely submitted; requiring certain individuals to submit a certain affidavit regarding the submission of a certain form; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Retirement and Pension System - Administration of Benefits - Clarification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (Y: 97 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateReturned Passed
2021-04-12HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2021-04-12HouseFloor Amendment {903829/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Withdrawn
2021-04-12HouseMotion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted (97-42)
2021-04-12HouseFloor Amendment {903829/1 (Delegate Szeliga)
2021-04-09HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-04-09HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2021-03-22HouseHearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-22HouseHearing canceled
2021-03-20HouseHearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-16HouseReferred Appropriations
2021-03-12SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2021-03-11SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments {789638/1 Adopted
2021-03-10SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2021-02-03SenateHearing 2/18 at 9:00 a.m.
2021-02-03SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Same As/Similar To

HB929 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-06 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Personnel and Pensions29303(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback