MD SB679 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that certain funds credited to the Fair Hill Improvement Fund be used exclusively for the grounds and facilities within the special event area at Fair Hill; authorizing the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $1,800,000 to the Fund; and authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to use certain funds for certain grants to certain entities for certain purposes.
Title
Fair Hill Improvement Fund – Special Event Area and Operations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-1) |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {393921/1 Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB658 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-31 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Grants
Horse Racing
Jurisdiction
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Revenue and Taxes
Special Events
Sports and Recreation
Stadium Authority
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Grants
Horse Racing
Jurisdiction
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Revenue and Taxes
Special Events
Sports and Recreation
Stadium Authority
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 11 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 11 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 5 | 908 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |