MD SB678 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-10)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the qualifications an individual must have to be appointed as a notary public; authorizing certain persons to charge a certain fee for the performance of a certain notarial act; authorizing a notarial officer to perform certain notarial acts except under certain circumstances; prohibiting certain individuals from charging a fee to perform a notarial act; providing for the manner in which notarial acts for remotely located individuals are to be performed except under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Government - Notarial Acts and Notaries Public

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-2) (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 407
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (133-2)
2019-04-08HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-08SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-08HouseDelegates Pena-Melnyk, Johnson, and Krebs
2019-04-08HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-08HouseHouse Refuses to Recede
2019-04-08SenateSenators Hester, West, and Washington
2019-04-08SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-08SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2019-04-08SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)
2019-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {256988/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-21HouseHearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {658472/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects

Administrative Agencies
Advertising
Agents and Brokers
Archives
Armed Forces
Blind Persons
Certifications
Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Crimes and Punishments
Cybersecurity
Data
Deaf Persons
Death
Demographics
Disabilities
Discipline
Disclosure
Drivers' Licenses
Education
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Ethics
Evidence
Examinations
Federal Government
Fees
Forms
Fraud
Governor
Hearings
Identification
Inspections
internet
Judges
Jurisdiction
Language
Liability
Literacy
Mobile Devices
Notaries Public
Notices
Oaths
Parents and Guardians
Penalties and Sentences
Photography
Postal Service
Privacy
Public Information
Public Officials
Publications
Real Property
Recordings
Records
Residency
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Secretary of State
Signatures
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Video
Witnesses
Work, Labor and Employment

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0678&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0678f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0678t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0678e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_407_sb0678e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0678_65847201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0678_25698801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0678_59372101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0678_17302601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0008/sb0678.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0678_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0656.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0678_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1371.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0678_17302601.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1614.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1453.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback