MD SB678 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the employment categories of certain employees of the State Department of Education; requiring that all positions in the Department be appointed positions in the professional service and skilled service as well as the executive service and management service, subject to a certain exception; requiring the Department to determine which employment classifications would be described as being in the skilled service or the professional service; providing certain requirements for employees hired beginning on July 1, 2018; etc.
Title
State Department of Education - Employment Categories and Practices
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] |
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] | Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D] | Sen. Craig Zucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (90-49) (Y: 91 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-13) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-13) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2017-12-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (90-49) |
2018-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-04-09 | House | Hearing 4/09 at 3:45 p.m. |
2018-04-09 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2018-04-06 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-13) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {877776/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Education, State Department of
School Administration
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor and Employment
School Administration
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Work, Labor and Employment