MD SB678 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a beauty salon permit holder to allow dogs and other pets on the premises of the beauty salon in accordance with regulations adopted by the State Board of Cosmetologists; prohibiting a Board inspector from issuing a citation for the presence of an animal in a beauty salon unless the beauty salon permit holder violates specified regulations; authorizing the Board to establish a specified civil penalty only in accordance with specified regulations; and requiring the Board to adopt specified regulations on or before October 1, 2017.
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Pets on Premises of Beauty Salons - Authorized
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Animals
Business Regulation and Occupations
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Cosmetologists
Inspections
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Rules and Regulations
Business Regulation and Occupations
Civil Actions
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Cosmetologists
Inspections
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Rules and Regulations