MD SB678 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of Juvenile Services to develop a Community-Based Diversion Pilot Program; requiring the Secretary to consult with representatives from the Annie E. Casey Foundation when developing the Pilot Program; establishing the purpose of the Pilot Program; requiring the Secretary to establish a specified juvenile day-treatment center in Baltimore City, require specified juveniles to report daily to the treatment center, establish specified community monitoring, and hire specified counselors; etc.
Title
Juvenile Services - Community-Based Diversion Pilot Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Counselors
Group Homes
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Medical Assistance
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Counselors
Group Homes
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Medical Assistance
Reports
Rules and Regulations