MD SB676 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Rereferred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a court to vacate a certain probation before judgment or judgment of conviction under certain circumstances; establishing the requirements for a certain motion; requiring the State to notify a certain defendant of the filing of a certain motion in a certain manner; authorizing the defendant to file a response to a certain motion within 30 days after receipt of a certain notice; requiring that a certain victim or victim's representative be notified of a certain hearing; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Postconviction Review - State's Motion to Vacate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2019-04-08HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {758171/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback