MD SB675 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Judiciary, in consultation with domestic violence and child abuse organizations, to develop a training program for judges presiding over child custody cases involving child abuse or domestic violence and to review and update the training program at certain intervals; requiring the training program to include certain information; requiring the Maryland Judiciary to make information on a certain training program available on request; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Custody - Cases Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence - Training for Judges and Child's Counsel

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24SenateUnfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-02-09SenateHearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-02-09SenateHearing canceled
2021-02-04SenateHearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
2021-02-03SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB1036 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-10 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Law9101.3(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law9101.4(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law9109(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback