MD SB675 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-10)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-10)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain research facilities using dogs or cats for scientific research purposes to take certain steps to provide for the adoption of a certain dog or cat that is no longer needed for research purposes; authorizing certain research facilities to enter into collaborative agreements with animal rescue organizations for certain purposes; etc.
Title
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {273925/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (16-26) (Y: 17 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {273925/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (16-26) (Y: 17 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-15 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Floor Amendment {273925/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (16-26) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {504634/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Adoption - see also- Parents and Guardians
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Animal Shelters
Animals
Contracts
Dogs
Industry and Technology
Medical Research
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Health
Reports
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Animal Shelters
Animals
Contracts
Dogs
Industry and Technology
Medical Research
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Health
Reports