MD SB673 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Urban Agriculture Grant Program in the Department of Agriculture to increase the viability of urban farming and improve access to urban-grown foods; establishing an Urban Agriculture Grant Fund to provide grants to nonprofit organizations in Baltimore City; requiring the Secretary of Agriculture to administer the Fund; authorizing the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation for the Fund; requiring the Department to seek input from certain entities in adopting certain regulations; etc.
Title
Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-3) |
2021-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {720517/1 Adopted |
2021-04-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {974339/1 Adopted |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB269 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Subjects
Agriculture
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Environmental Matters
Food
Grants
Minorities
Nonprofit Organizations
Planning, Department of
Real Property
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Urban Areas
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Environmental Matters
Food
Grants
Minorities
Nonprofit Organizations
Planning, Department of
Real Property
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Urban Areas
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Agriculture | 2 | 2001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 2002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 2003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 2004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 2005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |