MD SB673 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $250,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the National Center on Institutions and Alternatives, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, site improvement, and capital equipping of the National Center on Institutions and Alternatives facility, located in Baltimore County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - National Center on Institutions and Alternatives Expansion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 3:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Baltimore County
Courts
Job Training
Mental and Behavioral Health
State Bonds
State Debt (Bond Bills)
Vulnerable Adults
Youth
Courts
Job Training
Mental and Behavioral Health
State Bonds
State Debt (Bond Bills)
Vulnerable Adults
Youth