MD SB670 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB551

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 598
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing from $15,000 to $25,000 the maximum amount in controversy in a civil action in which a party may not demand a jury trial; providing for the construction and application of the Act; and making the Act contingent on the passage and ratification of a certain constitutional amendment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 598
2021-04-12SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (42-4)
2021-04-12SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed (100-35)
2021-04-09HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-09HouseMotion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
2021-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {422418/1 Adopted
2021-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2021-03-23HouseHearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-17HouseReferred Judiciary
2021-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (42-5)
2021-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-03-12SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-03-11SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-02-09SenateHearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-02-09SenateHearing canceled
2021-02-04SenateHearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
2021-02-03SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB899 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
SB551 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Hearing 2/18 at 12:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings4402(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback