MD SB670 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creating in Howard County an exception to the alcoholic beverages license application or renewal requirements for a Class C (continuing care retirement community) beer, wine, and liquor license issued to a nonprofit organization; requiring that the license be applied for and issued to a manager or supervisor and two officers under specified circumstances; and allowing residents and their guests in a continuing care retirement community that holds the license to consume beer, wine, or liquor not purchased from the community; etc.
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-30 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Aging, Department of
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Continuing Care
Education
Elderly Persons
Food
Howard County
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Registration
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Continuing Care
Education
Elderly Persons
Food
Howard County
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Registration