MD SB670 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the State Department of Assessments and Taxation from imposing a fee for the filing of specified documents by corporations or business entities with 10 or fewer employees; requiring specified corporations to compute Maryland taxable income using a specified combined reporting method; requiring, subject to specified regulations, specified groups of specified corporations to file a combined income tax return reflecting the aggregate income tax liability of all the members of the group; etc.
Title
Corporations and Business Entities - Filing Fees and Combined Reporting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Comptroller
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Fees
Income Tax
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Taxes - Income
Comptroller
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Fees
Income Tax
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Taxes - Income