MD SB668 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB220
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding, renaming, and altering certain provisions relating to a certain truancy reduction program in certain juvenile courts; authorizing a county or circuit administrative judge to establish a certain Truancy Reduction and School Engagement Program in certain juvenile courts in accordance with rules adopted by the Court of Appeals; and requiring the Chief Judge of the Court of Appeals to annually report certain information to the General Assembly.
Title
Juveniles - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Expansion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {433525/1 Adopted |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB668 (Carry Over) 2022-03-23 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
HB823 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-03 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
HB823 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-03 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Circuit Courts
Court of Appeals
Court Orders
Education
Judges
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Truancy
Court of Appeals
Court Orders
Education
Judges
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Truancy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8C-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8C-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8C-03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8C-04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8C-05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8C-06 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8C-07 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8C-08 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8C-09 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8C-10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8C-11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8C-12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |