MD SB667 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a county board of education to administer the early learning assessment to enrolled prekindergarten students in the county; authorizing the assessment to be administered to a specified student for the purpose of identifying a disability; and requiring a county board to consult with prekindergarten teachers, including teachers nominated by the exclusive bargaining representative, in determining how to implement the assessment.
Title
Education - Prekindergarten Student Assessment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-2) (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-2) (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) |
2017-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {515162/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-16 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-2) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {764535/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Assessments
Auditors and Audits
Disabilities
Education
Primary and Secondary Education
Rules and Regulations
Students
Auditors and Audits
Disabilities
Education
Primary and Secondary Education
Rules and Regulations
Students