MD SB664 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the State or a local jurisdiction from imposing or levying a vehicle-miles-traveled tax or other similar fees, tolls, or taxes; prohibiting the State or a local jurisdiction from requiring the installation of a device in or on a privately owned vehicle to facilitate the reporting of vehicle-miles traveled; and providing for the application of specified provisions of the Act.
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Electronic Surveillance
Fees
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Fees
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections