MD SB661 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain definition of "health care provider" to include pharmacists for the purposes of provisions of law related to the destruction of medical records; and requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to establish a workgroup to identify options and requirements necessary for the reimbursement of pharmacists and submit a report to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 31, 2022.
Title
Pharmacists - Status as Health Care Providers and Study on Reimbursement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {253522/1 Adopted |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Ethics
Health - Insurance
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Nurse Practitioners
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Reimbursement Rates
Rules and Regulations
Health - Insurance
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Nurse Practitioners
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Reimbursement Rates
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 4 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |