MD SB660 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Taxpayer Advocate Division in the Office of the Comptroller to assist taxpayers and their representatives in resolving certain taxpayer problems and complaints and represent taxpayers' interests in a certain manner.
Title
Office of the Comptroller – Taxpayer Advocate Division
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Sarah Elfreth [D] | Sen. Shelly Hettleman [D] | Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2023-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2023-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {783124/1 Adopted |
2023-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2023-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2023-03-26 | House | Hearing canceled (Appropriations) |
2023-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred Appropriations Ways and Means |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {173424/1 Adopted |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB707 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Subjects
Comptroller
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Legislation
Privacy
Public Officials
Rules and Regulations
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Legislation
Privacy
Public Officials
Rules and Regulations
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 2 | 102.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |