MD SB660 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Chancellor of the University System of Maryland to act on behalf of the University System of Maryland and certain system institutions for the purpose of collective bargaining; providing for the negotiation of a certain consolidated memorandum of understanding under certain circumstances; making conforming changes; repealing a provision of law authorizing certain presidents of certain system institutions to cooperate for the purpose of collective bargaining; etc.
Title
Collective Bargaining - Chancellor of the University System of Maryland - Negotiations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB641 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-31 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agents and Brokers
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contracts
Higher Education
School Administration
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
State Universities and Colleges
Work, Labor and Employment
Agents and Brokers
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contracts
Higher Education
School Administration
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
State Universities and Colleges
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 2A-09 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 3 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0660?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0660f.pdf |