MD SB658 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Renaming the Maryland Emergency Management Agency to be the Maryland Department of Emergency Management; establishing the Department as a principal department of the Executive Branch of State government; providing that the head of the Department is the Secretary of Emergency Management; requiring the Secretary to be appointed by the Governor with the advice and consent of the Senate; transferring the Maryland 9-1-1 Board from the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to the Department of Emergency Management; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Department of Emergency Management - Establishment and Transfer of Maryland 9-1-1 Board

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 288
2021-04-06SenateReturned Passed
2021-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2021-04-02HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-31HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2021-03-20HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2021-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2021-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {354534/1 Adopted
2021-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-17SenateHearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-17SenateHearing canceled
2021-02-02SenateHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-29SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB990 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment5803(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions4314.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General17602(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General17701(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment9232(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources31005(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources31015(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety1301(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety1305(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety13501(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety14101(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety14101.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety14102(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety14103(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety14104(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety14106(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety14107(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety14108(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety14109(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety14110(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety14112(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety14115(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety14116(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety14201(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety14603(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety14803(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety8101(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety8102(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety8103(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety8104(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety8105(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety8106(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government101503(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government8201(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government92901(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback