MD SB656 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-26 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-26 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the number of members on the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County from three to five members; and increasing the number of members that may belong to the same political party from two to four.
Title
Anne Arundel County – Board of License Commissioners – Membership
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Anne Arundel County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Political Parties
Public Officials
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Anne Arundel County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Political Parties
Public Officials
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 11 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |