MD SB654 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB948
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the name of the Outreach and Advocacy Program in the Department of Veterans Affairs to be the Communications, Outreach, and Advocacy Program; requiring the Program, in collaboration with the Maryland Higher Education Commission, to actively help veterans and their dependents become aware of and access education and training benefits to which they are entitled; altering certain responsibilities of the director of the Program; repealing a requirement that the Department develop and maintain a certain database of veterans; etc.
Title
Veterans Affairs - Communications, Outreach, and Advocacy Program - Veterans Advocacy and Education Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2022-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments {173425/1 Adopted |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {483422/1 Adopted |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB279 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
SB948 (Carry Over) 2021-04-06 - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
SB948 (Carry Over) 2021-04-06 - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Subjects
Advertising
Animals
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Data
Education
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Federal Government
Higher Education Commission
internet
Job Training
Names
Public Information
Public Officials
Social Media
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Veterans
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Work, Labor, and Employment
Animals
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Data
Education
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Federal Government
Higher Education Commission
internet
Job Training
Names
Public Information
Public Officials
Social Media
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Veterans
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 940 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 941 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 942 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 943 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 944 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 946 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |