MD SB65 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a copy of specified decisions by the Workers' Compensation Commission may be sent by electronic means to a party or the party's attorney of record under specified circumstances.
Title
Workers' Compensation - Claim Processing - Electronic Delivery of Decisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 16 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2013-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2013-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-22 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2012-10-04 | Senate | Pre-filed |