MD SB649 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Hearing: Feb 27 @ 12:00 pm Senate Judicial Proceedings Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a custodian of records for the Motor Vehicle Administration to deny inspection by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement of the part of a public record that contains personal information unless the custodian is provided with a valid warrant or valid subpoena issued by a federal court or a court of this State; and requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to annually report certain information to the General Assembly on or before June 1, 2022, and each June 1 thereafter; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Information Act – Motor Vehicle Administration – Warrant for Personal Information and Reporting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06SenateHearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB892 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
General Provisions4320(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback