MD SB649 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board for the City of Annapolis to issue a refillable container permit for draft beer to a holder of a Class E license; providing an annual permit fee of $50 for an applicant whose license has an off-sale privilege and $500 for an applicant whose license does not have an off-sale privilege.
Title
City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit for Draft Beer
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2016-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Annapolis
Beverage Containers
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Rules and Regulations
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Annapolis
Beverage Containers
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Rules and Regulations