MD SB647 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 611
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the Maryland earned income tax credit to allow certain individuals without qualifying children to claim an increased credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; and making the Act contingent on the taking effect of another Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Earned Income Tax Credit - Individuals Without Qualifying Children - Repeal of Minimum Age Requirement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-6) (Y: 130 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 611
2018-04-09SenateReturned Passed
2018-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (129-6)
2018-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2018-03-21HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-13HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2018-03-13SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-03-09SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-09SenateFavorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2018-03-08SenateSpecial Order until 3/9 (Senator Ready) Adopted
2018-03-08SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2018-03-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {869830/1
2018-03-07SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-02-27SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-01SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback