MD SB645 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - First Reading Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]


Establishing a Class B-TM (theater/museum) beer, wine, and liquor license in Allegany County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue the license for use by a theater/museum that has a ballroom with a maximum seating capacity of 300 per event; establishing that the license authorizes the license holder to sell at retail beer, wine, and liquor for on-premises consumption and in conjunction with certain events; establishing the hours and days for sale for the license; setting a $350 fee; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-TM (Theater/Museum) License


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]


2018-03-13HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2018-03-12SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-03-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-08SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-08SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-23SenateHearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-01SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


Maryland State Sources

Bill Comments