MD SB642 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Task Force to Study Transportation Access for the purpose of reviewing certain information, findings, and recommendations to improve transportation access for certain individuals and families in Maryland; requiring the Task Force to make a final report of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force to Study Transportation Access

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {597170/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-07SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback