MD SB64 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that certain employees of the Maryland School for the Deaf are not entitled to annual leave with pay; and clarifying that employees of the Maryland School for the Deaf who work 11 months or less in a calendar year are entitled to a certain amount of personal leave with pay for each calendar year under certain circumstances.
Title
Maryland School for the Deaf - Employees - Annual and Personal Leave
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-10-26 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Deaf Persons
Leave
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Salaries and Compensation
School Administration
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Personnel
Teachers
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Leave
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Salaries and Compensation
School Administration
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Personnel
Teachers
Time
Work, Labor and Employment