MD SB636 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB946
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 583
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 583
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Passive House Pilot Program in the Department of Housing and Community Development to assist a nonprofit organization in partnership with neighboring high schools and institutes of higher education to provide students with career and technical educational experiences through the renovation of residential properties to become passive houses; requiring the Department to solicit proposals from nonprofit organizations that feature certain elements; requiring the Department to give priority to certain proposals; etc.
Title
Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood Revitalization - Passive House Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 113 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 583 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (113-25) |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:15 p.m. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB946 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1073 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1073 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Age
Architects
Certifications
Construction
Economic and Community Development
Education
Engineers
Higher Education
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Residential Property
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Students
Sunset
Architects
Certifications
Construction
Economic and Community Development
Education
Engineers
Higher Education
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Nonprofit Organizations
Residential Property
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Students
Sunset
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Housing and Community Development | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 6 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 6 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 6 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 6 | 804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 6 | 805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |