MD SB636 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Commission on the Commemoration of the 100th Anniversary of the Passage of the 19th Amendment to the United States Constitution to include a representative of the Maryland Heritage Women's History Center.
Title
Commission on the Commemoration of the 100th Anniversary of the Passage of the 19th Amendment to the United States Constitution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2017-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Constitution, U.S.
Constitutional Amendments
Historical Matters
Holidays and Special Dates
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Women
Constitution, U.S.
Constitutional Amendments
Historical Matters
Holidays and Special Dates
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Women