MD SB633 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 238
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 238
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to require entrance-level and in-service police training conducted by the State and each county and municipal police training school to include in their curriculum training relating to the criminal laws concerning recognition of, reporting of, and response to hate crimes.
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Training Requirements - Hate Crimes
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Waldstreicher [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] | Sen. Shelly Hettleman [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Sen. Chris West [R] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 238 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-26 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {888575/1 Adopted |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB541 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 237
Subjects
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Discrimination
Municipal Corporations
Police Training and Standards Commission
Public Safety
Crimes and Punishments
Discrimination
Municipal Corporations
Police Training and Standards Commission
Public Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 3 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |