MD SB633 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a refillable container permit in Washington County; authorizing the Washington County Board of License Commissioners to issue a refillable container permit to the holders of specified licenses for specified fees and subject to specified requirements; specifying permit fees; specifying that the hours of sale for the permit begin at the same time as those for the license already held by the person to whom the refillable container permit is issued; etc.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Washington County - Refillable Container Permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) |
2015-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {403990/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2015-03-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Advertising
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Fees
Forms
Hearings
Labeling
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notices
Washington County
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Fees
Forms
Hearings
Labeling
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notices
Washington County