MD SB632 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Senators Rosapepe, Mathias, and Hershey
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Senators Rosapepe, Mathias, and Hershey
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Commerce to create, own, control, or be a member of a corporation, limited liability company, partnership, or any other entity, whether operated for profit or not for profit; requiring the Department to issue a request for proposals to select a management entity to establish a certain investment fund; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill for fiscal years 2020 and 2021 an appropriation of $3,750,000 for the Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund; etc.
Title
Maryland Smart Growth Investment Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (105-33) (Y: 106 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senators Rosapepe, Mathias, and Hershey |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (105-33) |
2018-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {344263/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {387475/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Finance |