MD SB631 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Veto sustained (0-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Veto sustained (0-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified fines to be remitted to the Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund; establishing the Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund; providing for the uses, purposes, sources of funding, investment of money, and auditing of the Fund; requiring the Executive Director of the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention (GOCCP) to administer the Fund; providing that the Fund is a continuing, nonlapsing fund not subject to specified provisions of law; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Abuse Emergency Compensation Fund - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-5) (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Senate | Veto sustained (0-44) |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-5) |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-15 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {288174/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Abuse
Animals
Clerks of Court
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
District Courts
Fines
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Animals
Clerks of Court
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
District Courts
Fines
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset