MD SB630 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-15)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Maryland Efficient Grant Application Council to study and make recommendations to the Governor's Grants Office and the Board of Public Works regarding the entire life cycle of a grant and the creation of certain materials for use by certain grant-making agencies, grant applicants, and grant recipients; requiring the Board to adopt by regulation a uniform grant application form, uniform financial controls and reporting requirements, and uniform performance progress reporting requirements on or before July 1, 2021: etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grant Applications and Reporting - Uniform Forms and Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenatePassed Enrolled
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2020-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-16HouseFloor Committee Amendment {376681/1 Adopted
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {806984/1 Adopted
2020-03-15HouseMotion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {806984/1
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-03-13HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2020-03-13SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-03-11SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments {704933/1 Adopted
2020-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-05SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB1539 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Passed Enrolled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Finance and Procurement2209(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0630?ys=2020RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0630f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0630t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0630e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0630_70493301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0630_80698401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0000/sb0630_37668101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/sb0630_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/sb0630_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0921.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/0996.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/0628.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback