MD SB629 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-09 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-09 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain requirements for a model policy prohibiting bullying, harassment, or intimidation in public and nonpublic schools; requiring that if the act of bullying, harassment, or intimidation is determined to be motivated by the alleged victim's actual or perceived sex, sexual orientation, or gender identity, notification to the parent or guardian of the alleged victim shall be at the discretion of the alleged victim; and requiring the State Board of Education and each nonpublic school to update the model policy by September 1, 2023.
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Policies on Bullying, Harassment, or Intimidation - Revisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB576 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-16 - Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Subjects
Discrimination
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Gender
Harassment
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Reports
Sexual Offenses
Sexual Orientation
Students
Time
Victims
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Gender
Harassment
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Reports
Sexual Offenses
Sexual Orientation
Students
Time
Victims
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 7 | 424 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 424.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 424.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0629?ys=2023RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2023RS/bills/sb/sb0629f.pdf |