MD SB627 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-10 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (94-42)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing certain provisions of the Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights; providing for the discipline of law enforcement officers; providing that provisions of the Act supersede and preempt any other law of the State, a county, or a municipal corporation; providing that a law enforcement agency or the agency's superior governmental authority and a collective bargaining unit may not enter into a certain agreement; recodifying certain provisions of law relating to certain employment rights and the expungement of certain records; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Repeal and Procedures for Discipline

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (Y: 94 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (94-42)
2021-04-10HouseFloor Amendment {783123/1 (Delegate Dumais) Withdrawn
2021-04-10HouseFloor Amendment {893824/1 (Delegate Malone) Adopted
2021-04-09HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-09HouseMotion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
2021-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {312211/1 Adopted
2021-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2021-03-12HouseHearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-04HouseReferred Judiciary
2021-03-03SenateThird Reading Passed (33-14)
2021-03-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-02SenateFloor Amendment {463126/1 (Senator Jackson) Adopted
2021-03-02SenateCommittee Amendment {698971/1 Adopted
2021-02-26SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted
2021-02-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {698971/1
2021-02-26SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-01-31SenateHearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-31SenateHearing canceled
2021-01-29SenateHearing 2/03 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-29SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety3101(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3102(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3103(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3104(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3105(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3106(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3107(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3108(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3109(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3110(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3111(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3112(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3113(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3114(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3115(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3207(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0627?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0627f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0627t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0627_69897101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0627_46312601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0627_31221101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0627_89382401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0627_78312301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0627_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0627_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0327.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1372.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback