MD SB626 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that the members of the Health Services Cost Review Commission be appointed with the advice and consent of the Senate of Maryland.
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Members - Appointment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366 |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Executive Nominations |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Executive Nominations |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Public Officials
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Public Officials
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |