MD SB626 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified registered nurses who personally prepare and dispense specified drugs and devices in local health departments in accordance with specified provisions of law or to specified patients to comply with a specified formulary and specified requirements; establishing the Committee on Personally Preparing and Dispensing Drugs and Devices by Registered Nurses in Local Health Departments; providing for the composition, terms, chair, and staffing of the Committee; etc.
Title
Registered Nurses - Local Health Departments - Requirements for Personally Preparing and Dispensing Drugs and Devices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2015-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-18 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Clinics
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Drugs
Equipment
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Inspections
Job Training
Labeling
Nurses
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Privacy
Public Health
Records
Storage
Substance Abuse
Clinics
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Drugs
Equipment
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Inspections
Job Training
Labeling
Nurses
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Privacy
Public Health
Records
Storage
Substance Abuse