MD SB625 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting certain employees of transportation network companies that provide transit service to persons with disabilities under contract with the Maryland Transit Administration from certain requirements relating to a certain criminal history records check and completion of a certain course; requiring transportation network companies that provide transit service to persons with disabilities under contract with the Administration to run certain annual background checks on certain employees; etc.
Title
Transportation of Persons With Disabilities - Transportation Network Companies - Employee Requirements and Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {683627/1 Adopted |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB726 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-14 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Criminal Background Investigations
Disabilities
Disabled
Emergency Bills
Job Training
Mass Transit
Rules and Regulations
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Disabilities
Disabled
Emergency Bills
Job Training
Mass Transit
Rules and Regulations
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 10 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 7 | 102.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |