MD SB624 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering a certain definition of regulated firearm to include a certain unfinished frame or receiver; authorizing a person to continue to possess a certain firearm or unfinished frame or receiver on or after January 1, 2022, if the firearm or unfinished frame or receiver is marked with a unique serial number and the person maintains a certain record log; prohibiting a person from possessing a certain firearm or unfinished frame or receiver on or after January 1, 2022; providing certain penalties; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - Untraceable and Undetectable Firearms

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-01SenateHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-29SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB638 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-05 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety5101(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety5114(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety5117.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety5142(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety5144(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety5701(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety5702(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety5703(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety5704(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety5705(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety5706(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety5707(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback