MD SB623 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from committing a certain prohibited act with the intent to interrupt or impair the functioning of a health care facility or a public school; prohibiting a person from knowingly possessing ransomware with the intent to use the ransomware for the purpose of introduction into the computer, computer network, or computer system of another person without authorization; authorizing a victim of a certain offense to bring a civil action for damages against a certain person; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2021-03-23 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Floor Amendment {893029/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {658070/1 Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {658070/1 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB425 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Subjects
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Court Costs
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Cybersecurity
Damages
Health Care Facilities
Penalties and Sentences
Public Schools
Victims
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Court Costs
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Cybersecurity
Damages
Health Care Facilities
Penalties and Sentences
Public Schools
Victims
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 7 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |