MD SB623 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB290
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, to the extent authorized under federal law, certain entities to include payments made by certain persons when calculating certain contributions to an out-of-pocket maximum or a cost-sharing requirement for an insured, a subscriber, or a member; and applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2021
Title
Health Insurance - Out-of-Pocket Maximums and Cost-Sharing Requirements - Calculation
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D] | Sen. Clarence Lam [D] | Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
Sen. Edward Reilly [R] | Sen. Mary Washington [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB623 (Carry Over) 2020-02-04 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1360 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
HB1360 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Subjects
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0623?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0623f.pdf |